IL HB5809 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if a fireman is involved in a proceeding for a declaration of invalidity of marriage, legal separation, or dissolution of marriage at the time he or she withdraws or enters upon annuity, his or her contributions for widow's annuity shall be refunded, upon request and if consistent with the court's order, after the entry of the judgment declaring the invalidity of the marriage, the judgment for legal separation, or the judgment of dissolution of marriage. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act apply without regard to whether the fireman was in service on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CHI FIRE-WIDOW'S REFUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-19HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
4056-160Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback