IL HB5803 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning the offenses of intimidation and aggravated intimidation. Provides that a person also commits intimidation when, with intent to cause another to perform or to omit the performance of any act, he or she communicates to another, directly or indirectly by any means, a threat to cause the person to falsify, amend, or withdraw a report of his or her abuse. Provides that a person commits aggravated intimidation when he or she commits intimidation by causing a person 60 years of age or older or known to be a person with a disability to falsify, amend, or withdraw a report of his or her abuse. Provides that aggravated intimidation under these circumstances is a Class 2 felony for which the offender may be sentenced to a term of imprisonment of not less than 3 years nor more than 14 years. Defines "abuse" and "person with a disability".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-INTIMIDATION-ELDERLY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-09HouseTo Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-0.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-6Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-6.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback