IL HB5803 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning the offenses of intimidation and aggravated intimidation. Provides that a person also commits intimidation when, with intent to cause another to perform or to omit the performance of any act, he or she communicates to another, directly or indirectly by any means, a threat to cause the person to falsify, amend, or withdraw a report of his or her abuse. Provides that a person commits aggravated intimidation when he or she commits intimidation by causing a person 60 years of age or older or known to be a person with a disability to falsify, amend, or withdraw a report of his or her abuse. Provides that aggravated intimidation under these circumstances is a Class 2 felony for which the offender may be sentenced to a term of imprisonment of not less than 3 years nor more than 14 years. Defines "abuse" and "person with a disability".
Title
CRIM CD-INTIMIDATION-ELDERLY
Sponsors
Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] |
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-6.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5803&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5803.htm |