IL HB5796 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act by creating the Fair Business Treatment Law. Provides that if the Governor issues a proclamation declaring a disaster under the Act or an executive order relating to the same disaster for which the proclamation was issued, and the proclamation or executive order includes one or more restrictions upon the retail sale of goods or services within Illinois, the restriction must be enforced so as not to favor any one industry classification of persons engaged in the business of selling tangible personal property at retail over any other industry classification of such persons. Requires the Illinois Emergency Management Agency to develop a protocol for the fair enforcement of proclamations declaring a disaster under the Act. Requires the Agency, in developing and maintaining the protocol, to consult with relevant private sector stakeholders, including representatives of the Illinois retail sales industry. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAIR BUSINESS TREATMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2020-11-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2020-11-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2020-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer
2020-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2020-11-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2020-11-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-11-10HouseFirst Reading
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2020-06-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2020-06-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2020-06-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2020-06-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2020-05-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2033057.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback