IL HB5795 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0918
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. In the Article governing compulsory attendance of pupils, provides that the term "truant" means a child who is subject to compulsory school attendance and who is absent without valid cause, as defined in the Article, from such attendance for more than 1% but less than 5% of the past 180 days (rather than absent without valid cause from such attendance for a school day or portion thereof). Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TRUANT DEFN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0918
2018-08-17HouseEffective Date August 17, 2018
2018-08-17HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 010-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105526-2aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback