IL HB5793 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Postponed - Criminal Law
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Exempts from an eavesdropping violation, with the consent of the owner or lessee of the dwelling in which it is installed, the use of a doorbell or intercommunication device that has audio or video capabilities, or both. Defines "intercommunication device". Includes in the General Definitions Article of the Code that for the purposes of this eavesdropping exemption, "dwelling" means a house, apartment, mobile home, trailer, or other living quarters in which at the time of the alleged offense the owners or occupants actually reside or in their absence intend within a reasonable period of time to reside.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-EAVESDROPPING EXEMPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720514-3Amended CodeCitation Text
72052-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback