IL HB5786 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year, an in-school suspension program provided by a school district for any students in kindergarten through grade 12 shall focus on promoting non-violent conflict resolution and positive interaction with other students and school personnel. Provides that a school district may employ a substitute teacher to oversee an in-school suspension program in kindergarten through grade 12. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-IN-SCHOOL SUSPENSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-003-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback