IL HB5786 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1035
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1035
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year, an in-school suspension program provided by a school district for any students in kindergarten through grade 12 shall focus on promoting non-violent conflict resolution and positive interaction with other students and school personnel. Provides that a school district may employ a substitute teacher to oversee an in-school suspension program in kindergarten through grade 12. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-IN-SCHOOL SUSPENSION
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1035 |
2018-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2018 |
2018-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-003-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |