IL HB5784 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to establish and administer, by January 1, 2026, a Certified Family Health Aide Program that permits a legally responsible family caregiver or family member to receive specific training from a participating licensed home health agency, home nursing agency, or home services agency on the provision of private duty nursing services. Provides that a legally responsible family caregiver or family member who successfully completes training and meets all other applicable requirements under State or federal law shall receive certification as a certified family health aide and be eligible to provide private duty nursing services to a qualifying family member under the Early and Periodic Screening, Diagnostic and Treatment benefit or through any home and community-based services waiver program for medically fragile and technology dependent children. Provides that no home health agency, home nursing agency, home services agency, or legally responsible family caregiver or family member is required to participate in the program. Contains provisions on training and instruction requirements for certification; additional hands-on training provided by participating agencies; competency requirements for certified family health aides; background check requirements; reimbursement rates for certified family health aide services; Department rules and reporting requirements; monthly meetings between the Department and participating agencies during the implementation phase of the program; and other matters. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-FAMILY HLTH AIDE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-03-20HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-03-20HouseFirst Reading
2024-03-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-2cNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback