IL HB5782 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-16 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-16 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Assistance and Regulatory Reform Act. Modifies requirements concerning the Office of Business Permits and Regulatory Assistance. Provides that the office shall implement reforms to improve interagency coordination that allow for expeditious permitting issuance. Provides that the office shall utilize information technology tools to track project schedules and metrics to improve transparency and accountability of the permitting process, reduce uncertainty and delays, and reduce costs and risks to taxpayers. Modifies provisions and adds requirements concerning the provision of information and the expediting of permit reviews. Provides for the creation of an Interagency Permitting Advisory Committee. Provides additional requirements concerning the permitting process under the Act. Defines terms. Makes other changes.
Title
DCEO-BUSINESS ASSIST REFORM
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. David Friess [R] |
Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Amy Elik [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-11-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-08-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-08-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-08-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2022-08-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-08-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-08-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 608 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 608 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 608 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 608 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 608 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 608 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5782&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5782.htm |