IL HB5781 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that no later than January 1, 2019, a municipal police department, including the police department of a home rule municipality, shall employ a full-time licensed clinical social worker or a licensed social worker. Provides that these requirements may be met by the police department of a municipality with a population of less than 20,000 through an intergovernmental agreement with one or more units of local government to jointly employ a full-time social worker. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE-EMPLOY SOCIAL WORKER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.42New CodeSee Bill Text
65511-1-10.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback