IL HB5778 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the credit for wages paid to qualified veterans also extends to wages paid to a qualified veteran's spouse. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-VETERAN'S SPOUSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-20HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355217Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback