IL HB5778 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a licensee who has completed the firearm training as prescribed in the Act is presumed to know that he or she cannot carry in a building, premises, or real property specified in the Act as a prohibited area.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-PRESUMPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-07 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |