IL HB5777 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Establishes the fiscal year 2021 mileage reimbursement rate and allowance for lodging and meals. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Reverses the increase in compensation for members of the General Assembly to the level of compensation received by members for fiscal year 2019. Prohibits cost-of-living adjustments for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2020 for State government legislative and executive elected officers and appointees in positions for which the Compensation Review Board previously recommended or determined compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
GA-PER DIEM & COLAS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2020-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-05-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 120 | 6.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 120 | 6.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5777&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5777.htm |