IL HB5777 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Union of Contiguous Municipalities Division of the Illinois Municipal Code. Adds "consolidation" to the title of the Division. Provides that any 2 or more incorporated contiguous municipalities may be united into one incorporated city or village (rather than only cities) upon the presentation of a petition, signed by the lesser of 10% of the total number of electors of each municipality voting in the last election or 250 electors, to the election authority for the county in which the municipalities are situated or, if the municipalities are situated in 2 or more counties, in the county where the largest population of the subject municipalities resides. Removes provisions limiting union to municipalities wholly or substantially situation in a single county. Removes provisions requiring union by annexation by another city. Modifies the referendum question to approve the union. Provides that a union is not considered the creation or formation of a new political subdivision for purposes of the Election Code and makes other references to the Election Code. Provides that any elected official, member, employee, or contractor of a city or village subject to a petition to unite shall be expressly prohibited from using any governmental or public resources in opposing or supporting the petition. Provides that if the majority of the votes cast in any of the contiguous municipalities (rather than each municipality) in the petition is in favor of the proposition, then those contiguous municipalities are united. Makes other changes.
Title
MUNI-UNION OF CONTIGUOUS MUNI
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1113 |
2018-08-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 105-001-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-010-001 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 008-002-001 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |