IL HB5775 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable years 2018 and thereafter: (1) the maximum reduction under the senior citizens homestead exemption is $8,000 in Cook, DuPage, Lake, McHenry, and Will Counties and $5,000 in all other counties (currently, $8,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $5,000 in all other counties); and (2) the maximum reduction under the general homestead exemption is $10,000 in Cook, DuPage, Lake, McHenry, and Will Counties and $6,000 in all other counties (currently, $10,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $6,000 in all other counties). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-GENERAL AND SR. HOME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520015-170Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-175Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback