IL HB5774 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Lodging Establishment Human Trafficking Recognition Training Act. Requires hotels and motels to train employees in the recognition of human trafficking and protocols for reporting observed human trafficking to the appropriate authority. Provides that the Department of Labor shall develop the curriculum for the training. Requires the training program to be developed by January 1, 2019 and training by hotels and motels to begin by June 1, 2019. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMAN TRAFFICKING TRAINING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 029-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback