IL HB5774 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that after the approval by ordinance of a redevelopment plan and designation of redevelopment project area, the plan may be amended and additional properties may be added to the redevelopment project area without notice, a meeting of the joint review board, or a public hearing if (i) the amendment adds additional properties that include dilapidated public bridges owned by the municipality and (ii) the municipality approves the amendment by ordinance before October 1, 2012. Sets forth requirements concerning notice of the changes. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-TIF-PUBLIC HEARINGS
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-004-000 |
2012-03-08 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-03-08 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5774&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5774.htm |