IL HB5771 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2018, any publicly funded early childhood program receiving Preschool for All Block Grant funds or Preschool for All Expansion Block Grant funds shall collect and review its chronic absence data and determine what systems of support and resources are needed to engage chronically absent students and their families to encourage the habit of daily attendance and promote success; defines "chronic absence". Sets forth actions that are encouraged. Provides that, on or before July 1, 2020, and annually thereafter, an early childhood program shall report all the data collected to the State Board of Education, which shall make the report publicly available via the Illinois Early Childhood Asset Map Internet website and the Preschool for All Program or Preschool for All Expansion Program triennial report. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PRE-K-CHRONIC ABSENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-004-001
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-03HouseTo SPECIAL Issues Subcommittee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105526-19New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback