IL HB5770 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year, a school board shall notify students and the parents or guardians of students, electronically or in the form of a letter, that a student may be eligible to receive mental health services from the school district under a federal Section 504 plan. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 108-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-25HouseArrived in House
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush
2018-05-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 012-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-26SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105514-6.01Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5770&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5770.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5770eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5770enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5770ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5770sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5770sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5770_04252018_004000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5770_05252018_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5770sam002_05312018_091000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback