IL HB5769 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-13 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires that on or before July 1, 2019, the Department of Insurance and Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall jointly develop a uniform prior authorization form to be used by prescribing providers to request prior authorization for prescription drug benefits. Provides that on and after January 1, 2020, health insurers and managed care organizations that provide prescription drug benefits shall utilize and accept the uniform prior authorization form and prescribing providers may use the uniform prior authorization form. Provides criteria for developing the uniform prior authorization form. Provides requirements and limitations of prior authorization requests. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DRUGS-PRIOR AUTHORIZATION FORM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-13HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-10-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-08-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseFiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-31HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-21HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 009-005-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155364.3New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-5.12bNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback