IL HB5762 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act. Provides for increased penalties for delivery of methamphetamine and aggravated delivery of methamphetamine if the violation occurs in a protected place, such as a school; public park; synagogue, church, or other place primarily used for religious worship; or buildings or structures used primarily for housing or providing space for activities for senior citizens.
Title
METH DELIVERY PENALTIES
Sponsors
Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 646 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5762&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5762.htm |