IL HB5760 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Establishes the fiscal year 2019 mileage reimbursement rate and allowance for lodging and meals. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Prohibits cost-of-living adjustments for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2018 for State government legislative and executive elected officers and appointees in positions for which the Compensation Review Board previously recommended or determined compensation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA-PER DIEM & COLAS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2018-04-25SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-19SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-19SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-002
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-000-001
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251151Amended CodeCitation Text
251206.6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback