IL HB5760 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Establishes the fiscal year 2019 mileage reimbursement rate and allowance for lodging and meals. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Prohibits cost-of-living adjustments for or during the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2018 for State government legislative and executive elected officers and appointees in positions for which the Compensation Review Board previously recommended or determined compensation. Effective immediately.
Title
GA-PER DIEM & COLAS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-002 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-000-001 |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 120 | 6.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |