IL HB5759 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to 20%, but in no event to exceed $2,000, of the gross wages paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year to each creditable employee. Provides that a "creditable employee" is an employee who: (1) was employed by the taxpayer for the first time on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act; (2) completed his or her twenty-fourth consecutive month of employment with the taxpayer during the taxable year; (3) received unemployment benefits in this State for at least 2 months immediately prior to being hired by the taxpayer; and (4) was employed at a location in this State for at least 30 hours per week during the entire 24-month period of his or her employment with the taxpayer. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-JOB DEVELOPMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355227New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback