IL HB5757 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit for an Illinois business that increases its average full-time employee head count in the State for the taxable year by more than 20% over its average full-time employee head count in the State for the immediately preceding taxable year. Provides that the amount of the credit is 20% of its tax liability under this Act (other than its withholding tax liability) for the taxable year. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-HEAD COUNT CREDIT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-14HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 007-004-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355227New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback