IL HB5756 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0557
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Military Code of Illinois. Provides that there shall be no unlawful discrimination in the Illinois National Guard. Deletes provisions requiring specific military personnel numbers for the Organized Militia. Provides that the personnel strength of the Organized Militia shall instead be in accordance with tables and authorizations provided by the U.S. Army and Air Force and makes related changes. Repeals Sections concerning the appointment of personal aides by the Governor. Removes a reference to the Chief of Staff from a Section concerning the position's creation and makes related changes. Makes changes to provisions concerning the Adjutant General and Assistant Adjutants General. Deletes provisions requiring the Governor to appoint an Assistant Adjutant General as the head of the Division of Family Affairs and makes related changes. Provides that the Division of Family Affairs exists subject to appropriation. Makes changes to a Section concerning funeral honors duties. Provides that an officer's commission may be removed pursuant to the findings and recommendations of a board convened pursuant to federal regulations. Removes a requirement for the Governor to and grants the Adjutant General with discretion to convene a board to review a recommendation that an officer or member is undesirable. Provides the Governor with discretion to require that a bond may be given to an officer accountable for public property. Removes provisions concerning an "Armory Rental Account" and replaces it with the "National Guard Construction Fund". Repeals a Section concerning the powers of commanding officers of encampments or parades. Repeals a Section concerning individuals that interrupt military parades or drills. Makes other changes. Amends the Service Member's Employment Tenure Act. Provides that the definition for "military service" includes the full-time duties of the Adjutant General and Assistant Adjutants General.
Title
MILITARY CODE-NATIONAL GUARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0557 |
2016-07-15 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 019-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1805 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 20.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 22-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 28.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 30 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 30.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 42 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 43 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 92 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 97 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1805 | 98 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
330 | 60 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |