IL HB5754 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0780
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that a principal endorsement shall be affixed to a Professional Educator License of any holder who, in addition to other requirements in the Code, has at least 4 total years of teaching or 4 total years of working in the capacity of school support personnel in a school under the supervision of the Illinois Department of Corrections (or in combination with other permitted schools).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PRINCIPAL ENDORSEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0780
2018-08-10HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-10HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateDo Pass Education; 008-000-000
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-08SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-002-000
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback