IL HB5749 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Department of Transportation and local authorities, with respect to highways under their respective jurisdictions, in their discretion and upon application in writing may issue a special permit authorizing the applicant to move loads of agricultural commodities on a 2-axle single vehicle registered by the Secretary of State with the axle loads not to exceed 45%, on a 3-axle or 4-axle vehicle registered by the Secretary of State not to exceed 30%, and on a 5-axle vehicle registered by the Secretary of State not to exceed 20% above the allowed gross weights. Provides that the fee for such permit shall be $500 to be distributed into the State Construction Account Fund. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
VEH CD-OVERWEIGHT AXLE PERMITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1090 |
2018-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 103-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Fowler |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-002-002 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 059-034-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-002-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 15-301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |