IL HB5749 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Department of Transportation and local authorities, with respect to highways under their respective jurisdictions, in their discretion and upon application in writing may issue a special permit authorizing the applicant to move loads of agricultural commodities on a 2-axle single vehicle registered by the Secretary of State with the axle loads not to exceed 45%, on a 3-axle or 4-axle vehicle registered by the Secretary of State not to exceed 30%, and on a 5-axle vehicle registered by the Secretary of State not to exceed 20% above the allowed gross weights. Provides that the fee for such permit shall be $500 to be distributed into the State Construction Account Fund. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-OVERWEIGHT AXLE PERMITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-002-002
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 059-034-000
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-002-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625515-301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback