IL HB5749 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on August 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Department of Transportation and local authorities, with respect to highways under their respective jurisdictions, in their discretion and upon application in writing may issue a special permit authorizing the applicant to move loads of agricultural commodities on a 2-axle single vehicle registered by the Secretary of State with the axle loads not to exceed 45%, on a 3-axle or 4-axle vehicle registered by the Secretary of State not to exceed 30%, and on a 5-axle vehicle registered by the Secretary of State not to exceed 20% above the allowed gross weights. Provides that the fee for such permit shall be $500 to be distributed into the State Construction Account Fund. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-OVERWEIGHT AXLE PERMITS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-26HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1090
2018-08-26HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-26HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 103-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-001
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Fowler
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 015-000-000
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-24SenateDo Pass Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-24SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-002-002
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 059-034-000
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 008-002-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625515-301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5749&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5749.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5749eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5749enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1090.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5749ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5749sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5749sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5749_04272018_056000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5749_04272018_057000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5749_05302018_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5749sam002_05312018_089000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback