IL HB5748 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Hydraulic Fracturing Tax Act. Provides that the tax rate for the severance and production of oil or gas shall be 1.5% (rather than 3%) of the value of the oil or gas. Provides that for oil the tax shall be: (i) 1.5% of the value of the oil (rather than 3%) where the average daily production from the well in a month is less than 25 barrels; (ii) 2% of the value of the oil (rather than 4%) where the average daily production from the well in a month is between 25 barrels and 50 barrels; (iii) 2.5% of the value of the oil (rather than 5%) where the average daily production from the well in a month is between 50 barrels and 100 barrels; and (iv) 3% of the value of the oil (rather than 6%) where the average daily production from the well in a month is 100 barrels or more. Provides that for gas the tax shall be 3% (rather than 6%) of the value of the gas. Amends the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act. Deletes language stating that every applicant for a high volume horizontal hydraulic fracturing permit shall include a traffic management plan on his or her application.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HYDRAULIC FRAC-TAX&APPLICATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-03-08HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2257321-35Amended CodeCitation Text
354502-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback