IL HB5746 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 academic year, each public or private higher education institution shall require all entering freshmen to receive, during a period of orientation or in an introductory course offered by the institution, instruction aimed at increasing the awareness and prevention of sexual violence and hate crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HGHER ED-SEXUAL VIOLENCE STUDY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1102059.21Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback