IL HB5746 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act. Provides that, beginning with the 2019-2020 academic year, each public or private higher education institution shall require all entering freshmen to receive, during a period of orientation or in an introductory course offered by the institution, instruction aimed at increasing the awareness and prevention of sexual violence and hate crimes.
Title
HGHER ED-SEXUAL VIOLENCE STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 9.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5746&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5746.htm |