IL HB5745 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-9-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Family and Personal Protection Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall issue a license to carry a loaded or unloaded handgun to an applicant that meets specified qualifications, has provided the application and specified documentation, and has submitted the requisite fees. Provides that a license to carry a handgun entitles a licensee to carry a loaded handgun, either concealed or openly, on or about his or her person or in a vehicle, except in certain prohibited locations. Provides that the license shall be issued by the Department of State Police within 45 days of receipt from a sheriff and shall be valid throughout the State for a period of 5 years from the date of issuance. Provides for renewal of licenses. Establishes qualifications for licensees, certified firearms instructors, and instructor trainers. Provides for home rule preemption. Provides that the provisions of the Act are severable. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Prohibits from inspection and copying information about applications for licenses to carry a handgun and about license holders contained in the database created by the Family and Personal Protection Act, except as authorized by that Act. Amends the State Finance Act and the Criminal Code of 1961 to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONCEALED CARRY-FIREARMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad E. Halbrook
2012-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis
2012-04-10HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2012-03-30HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-30HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2012-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2012-03-29HouseFiscal Note Filed
2012-03-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-27HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2012-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman
2012-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2012-03-23HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2012-03-23HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2012-03-23HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2012-03-23HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2012-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2012-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley
2012-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr.
2012-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kent Gaffney
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott E. Penny
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto
2012-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
2012-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes
2012-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2012-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose
2012-03-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II
2012-03-06HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-001-000
2012-02-27HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2012-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.811New CodeSee Bill Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
720521-6Amended CodeCitation Text
720524-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback