IL HB5744 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that in a county having a population of 3,000,000 or more, the county sheriff shall establish with other law enforcement agencies a vehicle theft hotline to facilitate the location of stolen vehicles via their installed existing global positioning systems, collaborate with vehicle manufacturers and dealers to provide information and assistance to law enforcement officers in the investigation of vehicle theft, and ensure that consumers are provided with information concerning the hotline and any new or used vehicle manufactured with a global positioning system by publishing the information in a conspicuous location on the county sheriff's website. Provides that the manufacturer of any vehicle sold in this State shall establish a hotline available to State, county, and local law enforcement agencies exclusively for the purposes of law enforcement information sharing and the electronic tracking of vehicles stolen in vehicular hijacking incidents or that have been used in the commission of kidnapping, aggravated battery with a firearm, attempted homicide, or homicide. Provides that the manufacturer's hotline shall relay vehicle location information, including real-time vehicle location information whenever possible, to the 9-1-1 call center or designated dispatch center for the responding agency, to the best of the manufacturer's technical capability. Requires State, county, and local law enforcement agencies to use their respective 9-1-1 system call centers or designated dispatch centers for the purpose of verification of law enforcement officers' identities and bona fide incident report numbers related to incidents. Requires manufacturers to prepare written statements detailing tracking and disabling system capabilities and make them available to State, county, and local law enforcement agencies upon request. Requires that, if a vehicle is not subscribed to the manufacturer's tracking service, the manufacturer of any vehicle sold in this State shall waive all fees associated with initiating, renewing, reestablishing, or maintaining the location, disabling, or alert service with which the vehicle is equipped during a law enforcement response or investigation of specified offenses.
Title
VEH CD-STOLEN VEHICLE HOTLINES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-04-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-04-06 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | First Reading |
2022-04-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 4-110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 4-111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5744&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5744.htm |