IL HB5744 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Provides that certain attorney's fees shall be excluded from the demand given under specified provisions of the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that in any litigation or arbitration between a unit owner and the association or its board of managers or any individual member of the association or its board of managers regarding specified disputes, if the unit owner is deemed by the court or arbitrator to be the substantially prevailing party, then the court or the arbitrator shall award to the unit owner from the non-prevailing party reasonable attorney's fees and costs incurred by the unit owner in the litigation or arbitration.
Title
CONDOMINIUM ACT-ATTORNEY FEES
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Drury [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-23 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 605 | 9.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5744&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5744.htm |