IL HB5743 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Oil and Gas Act. Provides on and after the effective of the bill, a person may not engage in, and the Department of Natural Resources or any other State agency may not issue a permit for, the hydraulic fracturing of a well for exploration or production in the State. Repeals the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act. Defines "hydraulic fracturing". Effective immediately.
Title
OIL WELL FRACKING-REPEAL
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Drury [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | To Workforce Reconciliation Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 725 | 20.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 732 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5743&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5743.htm |