IL HB5742 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Changes the definition of "recurrent requester" to exclude requests made by members of the General Assembly and requests made to access and disseminate information pertaining to public policy and the administration of State government. Exempts from disclosure under the Act certain records in which opinions of a public body or its agents are expressed. Provides that the exemption does not apply if the records were produced in connection with the preparation of a report that is required to be publicly produced by an agency of the executive branch. Provides that the public body shall include with each denial of a request for public records an index that includes specified information. Provides that except in the case of a recurrent requester, a public body denying a request for public records shall place in an interest-bearing escrow account or other segregated account of the public body the sum of $7,500 for each request denied. Provides that the deposited funds shall remain in the account for a period of 60 days after the date of the public body's final denial of a request, or, if a requester has sought review of the denial or challenged the denial in court, until the review process has been completed or a final order has been entered. Provides that if a determination is made that the public body improperly denied a request to inspect or copy a public record, the deposited funds shall be awarded to the requester in addition to or as part of any other award. Makes other changes.
Title
FOIA-PENALTIES-RECORDS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Drury [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 9.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5742&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5742.htm |