IL HB5741 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Environmental Protection Agency, in coordination with the Illinois Sustainable Technology Center, to make an assessment of available treatment technologies for reducing and removing compounds of emerging concern from wastewater treatment facilities, the statewide applicability of the treatment technologies, and the costs associated with the treatment technologies. Requires the Agency and Illinois Sustainable Technology Center to submit a report of findings from the assessment to the General Assembly by June 30, 2020. Defines "compounds of emerging concern".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPA-COMPOUNDS-EMERGING CONCERN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-20HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 018-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415519.11New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback