IL HB5737 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Business Use Incentives for Large-Scale Development Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may enter into a financing agreement with an eligible industry with respect to an economic development project. Provides that those eligible industries are entitled to a credit against their Illinois income taxes in an amount not to exceed 5% of the gross wages paid in one year by an eligible industry to all eligible employees in new jobs. Provides that an "eligible industry" is a business located in the State which is engaged in interstate or intrastate commerce for the purpose of manufacturing, processing, or assembling products, conducting research and development, or providing services in interstate commerce, office industries, or agricultural processing, but excluding retail, health or professional services. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LARGE SCALE BUSINESS ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseTo Income Tax Subcommittee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355227New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback