IL HB5737 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Business Use Incentives for Large-Scale Development Act. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may enter into a financing agreement with an eligible industry with respect to an economic development project. Provides that those eligible industries are entitled to a credit against their Illinois income taxes in an amount not to exceed 5% of the gross wages paid in one year by an eligible industry to all eligible employees in new jobs. Provides that an "eligible industry" is a business located in the State which is engaged in interstate or intrastate commerce for the purpose of manufacturing, processing, or assembling products, conducting research and development, or providing services in interstate commerce, office industries, or agricultural processing, but excluding retail, health or professional services. Effective immediately.
Title
LARGE SCALE BUSINESS ACT
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Long [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5737&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5737.htm |