IL HB5731 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is unlawful for any person to knowingly possess, transport, or receive an unfinished frame or receiver, unless: (1) the party possessing or receiving the unfinished frame or receiver is a federal firearms importer or federal firearms manufacturer or the unfinished frame or receiver is possessed or transported by a person for transfer to a federal firearms importer or federal firearms manufacturer; or (2) the unfinished frame or receiver is required by federal law to be, and has been, imprinted with a serial number issued by a federal firearms importer or federal firearms manufacturer. Provides that it is unlawful for any person to knowingly sell, offer to sell, transfer, or purchase an unfinished frame or receiver, unless: (1) the party purchasing or receiving the unfinished frame or receiver is a federal firearms importer, federal firearms manufacturer, or federal firearms dealer; or (2) the unfinished frame or receiver is required by federal law to be, and has been, imprinted with a serial number issued by a federal firearms importer or federal firearms manufacturer. Provides for various violations concerning using a three-dimensional printer or similar device to manufacture or produce a firearm, firearm receiver, or major firearm component when not licensed as a federal firearms manufacturer or distributing by any means, including the Internet, to a person who is not licensed as a manufacturer, instructions in the form of computer-aided design files or other code or instructions stored and displayed in electronic format as a digital model that may be used to program a three-dimensional printer to manufacture or produce a firearm, firearm receiver or major component of a firearm. Provides exceptions. Provides that a first violation is a Class A misdemeanor and that a second or subsequent violation is a Class 3 felony. Adds a severability provision. Effective immediately.
Title
UNSERIALIZED FIREARMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5731&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5731.htm |