IL HB5726 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Provides that, if for any reason the General Assembly fails to make appropriations of amounts sufficient from the State Lottery Fund to the Department of the Lottery for payment of prizes to holders of winning lottery tickets or shares, including prizes related to Multi-State Lottery games, and payment of promotional or incentive prizes associated with the sale of lottery tickets, then the provision constitutes an irrevocable and continuing appropriation of all amounts necessary for that purpose, and the irrevocable and continuing authority for and direction to the Comptroller and to the Treasurer of the State to make the necessary transfers out of and disbursements from the State Lottery Fund for that purpose. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-CONTINUING APPROP
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5726&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5726.htm |