IL HB5726 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Sets forth the General Assembly's findings concerning the sale of energy drinks to minors. Defines "energy drink" as a beverage that contains the following ingredients or any combination of the following ingredients: (1) taurine, naturally occurring or synthesized; (2) guarana, including any extract or product of the plant or the seed of the plant; (3) glucuronolactone; and (4) any extract, herb, or tuber of any species of ginseng. Provides that it is unlawful in this State for any person to sell, offer for sale, or deliver an energy drink to a person under 18 years of age. Provides that the Director of Public Health is authorized to file a complaint and apply to the circuit court for, and such court may upon hearing and for cause shown grant, a temporary restraining order or preliminary or permanent injunction restraining any person from violating the provision concerning the Sale of energy drinks to minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD-DRUG-ENERGY DRINKS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2016-11-14HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2016-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2016-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106203.24New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback