IL HB5723 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, beginning 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the cents per gallon rate established by the Department of Revenue for the prepayment of tax by motor fuel retailers may not exceed $0.18 per gallon for motor fuel and 80% of that amount for gasohol and biodiesel blends. Provides that the rate of tax imposed under the Acts for motor fuel, gasohol, majority blended ethanol fuel, and biodiesel and biodiesel blends may not exceed that prepayment amount set by the Department of Revenue. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TAX-MOTOR FUEL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2022-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-03-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2022-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-03-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5723&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5723.htm |