IL HB5723 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a taxing district may abate any portion of its taxes on urban agricultural property located in the taxing district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-URBAN FARMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520018-184.15New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback