IL HB5723 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that a taxing district may abate any portion of its taxes on urban agricultural property located in the taxing district. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-URBAN FARMS
Sponsors
Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] |
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5723&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5723.htm |