IL HB5722 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Property Control Act. Provides that an agency covered by the Act may dispose of unneeded property, including real property, by sale or lease to any duly incorporated non-profit organization or association for the cultivation and sale of fresh fruits and vegetables on a tract of land of less than 5 acres within any local governmental unit, provided that the non-profit organization or association is not controlled, directly or indirectly, by any agricultural, commercial, or other business. Amends the Property Tax Code to provide a property tax exemption for non-profit organizations using land for the cultivation and sale of fresh fruits and vegetables.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE PROPERTY-URBAN FARMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
306057Amended CodeCitation Text
3520015-55Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback