IL HB5716 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Oil and Gas Act and the Hydraulic Fracturing Regulatory Act. Requires as part of the permit application for drilling or hydraulic fracturing operations the written consent of each owner of a mineral interest affected by the removal of minerals in the conduct of the proposed operations and each surface owner affected by the removal of minerals in the conduct of the proposed operations, unless he or she is the mineral interest owner as well providing consent as such. Provides notwithstanding any other provision of statutory or common law, a person shall not drill, conduct hydraulic fracturing operations, or remove minerals as a result of any means regulated by the Acts including, but not limited to, horizontal drilling, without the express, written consent of each owner of a mineral interest affected by the operations or removal of minerals in the conduct of the operations. Provides for enforcement by the Department of Natural Resources with penalties and cessation of operations for violations, and payment of treble the full market value of the mineral resource extracted in violation of this Act to the owner of the mineral interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MINERAL RIGHTS - OIL AND GAS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseTo Workforce Reconciliation Subcommittee
2018-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2257251Amended CodeCitation Text
2257256Amended CodeCitation Text
2257258eNew CodeSee Bill Text
2257321-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2257321-5Amended CodeCitation Text
2257321-90New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback